SFC Licences of NG Maukong 吳茂江
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chief Securities Limited 致富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 06 October 2021 | 29 March 2024 |
Great Bay Securities Limited 大灣區深港證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 20 July 2021 | 20 August 2021 |
Tai Tak Securities (Asia) Limited 大德證券(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 06 March 2018 | 18 June 2021 |
Phillip Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 輝立證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 21 June 2016 | 08 December 2016 |
Tung Shing Securities (Brokers) Limited 東盛證券(經紀)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 03 February 2016 | 31 May 2016 |