SFC Licences of MAN Kin Wan, Andrew 萬健運
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 21 December 2010 | |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 21 December 2010 | |
Tung Shing Futures (Brokers) Limited 東盛期貨(經紀)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 01 April 2003 | 16 December 2010 |
Tung Shing Securities (Brokers) Limited 東盛證券(經紀)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 April 2003 | 16 December 2010 |
Tung Shing Securities (Brokers) Limited 東盛證券(經紀)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 20 February 2004 |
Tung Shing Securities (Brokers) Limited 東盛證券(經紀)有限公司 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 20 February 2004 |
Tung Shing Securities (Brokers) Limited 東盛證券(經紀)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 20 February 2004 |