SFC Licences of TANG Pui Ling 鄧佩玲
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 April 2003 | 30 October 2011 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 01 April 2003 | 15 October 2010 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 5 | 01 April 2003 | 08 March 2004 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 08 March 2004 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 7 | 01 April 2003 | 02 March 2004 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 7 | 01 April 2003 | 19 February 2004 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 19 February 2004 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 19 February 2004 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 19 February 2004 |