SFC Licences of CHAN Shui Yung, Ellen 陳瑞容
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Sanfull Securities Limited 新富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 27 January 2021 | |
Okachi Investments (HK) Company Limited 岡地投資(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 13 December 2019 | 18 January 2021 |
Sunny World Investment Limited 新利偉投資有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 April 2003 | 29 November 2019 |
Sunny World Investment Limited 新利偉投資有限公司 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 19 August 2012 |
Sunny World Investment Limited 新利偉投資有限公司 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 30 March 2005 |
Sunny World Investment Limited 新利偉投資有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 30 March 2005 |