SFC Licences of HUI Kam Wing, Benjamin 許鑑榮
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bright Fund Management Limited 光明投資管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 11 April 2011 | 05 February 2021 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 28 January 2011 | |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 28 January 2011 | |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 28 January 2011 | |
FT Securities Limited 富通證券有限公司 | RE | 5 | 30 September 2005 | 16 May 2009 |
FT Securities Limited 富通證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 30 September 2005 | 16 May 2009 |
FT Securities Limited 富通證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 16 June 2005 | 16 May 2009 |
Jefferies Bache (Hong Kong) Limited | RE | 2 | 16 June 2005 | 04 October 2005 |