SFC Licences of HUI King Leung 許景亮
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 25 February 2005 | 29 November 2019 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 30 July 2004 | 29 November 2019 |
Southwest Securities (HK) Futures Limited 西證(香港)期貨有限公司 | RE | 2 | 01 April 2003 | 23 July 2004 |
Southwest Securities (HK) Futures Limited 西證(香港)期貨有限公司 | RE | 5 | 01 April 2003 | 23 February 2004 |
Southwest Securities (HK) Futures Limited 西證(香港)期貨有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 23 February 2004 |