SFC Licences of NG Wing Sze 伍詠思
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 February 2011 | 14 April 2011 |
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 February 2011 | 14 April 2011 |
First Sentier Investors (Hong Kong) Limited | RE | 1 | 13 August 2010 | 24 January 2011 |