SFC Licences of SHUM Wai Yin 岑慧賢
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 12 September 2014 | 27 September 2019 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 12 September 2014 | 27 September 2019 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 22 October 2003 | 21 October 2011 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 7 | 22 October 2003 | 19 February 2004 |
Celestial Finance Limited 時富財務有限公司 | RE | 8 | 01 April 2003 | 09 January 2004 |