SFC Licences of YU Ming Shing 余銘城
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bright Fund Management Limited 光明投資管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 10 August 2011 | 31 August 2023 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 12 January 2009 | |
CES Forex (HK) Limited 光證外匯(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 29 October 2008 | |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 20 April 2006 | |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 07 January 2004 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 07 January 2004 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 07 January 2004 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 7 | 01 April 2003 | 07 July 2003 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 April 2003 |