SFC Licences of LAM Sing To 林鍟滔
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
China Galaxy International Futures (Hong Kong) Co., Limited 中國銀河國際期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 29 May 2015 | |
China Galaxy International Securities (Hong Kong) Co., Limited 中國銀河國際證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 29 May 2015 | |
Luk Fook Futures (HK) Limited 六福期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 27 March 2014 | 08 May 2014 |
Luk Fook Securities (HK) Limited 六福證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 27 March 2014 | 08 May 2014 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 21 September 2006 | 26 September 2013 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 03 August 2005 | 26 September 2013 |
Centaline Wealth Management Limited 中原資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 28 June 2004 | 22 April 2005 |