SFC Licences of LEUNG Chun Sing 梁振聲
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
MIB Futures (Hong Kong) Limited 馬銀期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 27 January 2021 | 01 September 2021 |
MIB Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 馬銀證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 27 January 2021 | 01 September 2021 |
South China Futures Investment Limited 南華期貨投資有限公司 | RO | 2 | 15 May 2018 | 31 January 2019 |
Excellent Tide Securities Limited 佳湧證券有限公司 | RO | 1 | 15 May 2018 | 31 January 2019 |
RO | 4 | 15 May 2018 | 31 January 2019 | |
South China Futures Investment Limited 南華期貨投資有限公司 | RE | 2 | 21 December 2017 | 15 May 2018 |
Excellent Tide Securities Limited 佳湧證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 21 December 2017 | 15 May 2018 |
RE | 4 | 21 December 2017 | 15 May 2018 | |
KGI Futures (Hong Kong) Limited 凱基期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 18 February 2013 | 15 June 2016 |
KGI Asia Limited 凱基證券亞洲有限公司 | RE | 4 | 18 February 2013 | 15 June 2016 |
KGI Asia Limited 凱基證券亞洲有限公司 | RE | 1 | 18 February 2013 | 15 June 2016 |
South China Commodities Limited 南華期貨有限公司 | RE | 2 | 15 June 2012 | 28 September 2012 |
South China Securities Limited 南華證券投資有限公司 | RE | 1 | 15 June 2012 | 28 September 2012 |
KGI Asia Limited 凱基證券亞洲有限公司 | RE | 4 | 15 March 2010 | 08 June 2012 |
KGI Futures (Hong Kong) Limited 凱基期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 08 March 2010 | 08 June 2012 |
KGI Asia Limited 凱基證券亞洲有限公司 | RE | 1 | 08 March 2010 | 08 June 2012 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 11 July 2008 | 05 February 2010 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 02 December 2004 | 05 February 2010 |