SFC Licences of YEUNG Kwan Chiu 楊君超
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Roctec Futures Trading Company Limited 鷹達期貨有限公司 | RE | 2 | 19 December 2007 | 01 September 2009 |
Roctec Securities Company Limited 鷹達證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 21 September 2007 | 01 September 2009 |
East Asia Securities Company Limited 東亞證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 18 January 2006 | 01 September 2007 |