SFC Licences of HONG Kam Lun, Alan 康錦麟
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CES Forex (HK) Limited 光證外匯(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 04 July 2013 | |
Bright Fund Management Limited 光明投資管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 18 July 2011 | 31 August 2023 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 12 December 2008 | |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 09 July 2007 | |
Wisdom Wealth Management Limited 竑智理財策劃有限公司 | RE | 4 | 26 October 2006 | 30 March 2007 |