SFC Licences of CHEUNG Wai Ting 張瑋廷
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Seeds International Asset Management Limited 思源國際資產管理有限公司 | RO | 9 | 17 February 2022 | |
Seeds International Asset Management Limited 思源國際資產管理有限公司 | RO | 4 | 17 February 2022 | |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 08 March 2019 | 15 October 2021 |
China Everbright Securities (HK) Limited 中國光大證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 28 February 2018 | 17 April 2018 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 25 July 2013 | 15 October 2021 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 23 January 2007 | 28 April 2007 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 06 December 2006 | 28 April 2007 |