SFC Licences of LAU Ho Yin 劉浩然
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 March 2019 | 08 September 2020 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 17 June 2010 | 08 September 2020 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 19 July 2007 | 08 September 2020 |