SFC Licences of YEUNG Iris See Lok 楊詩樂
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Win Securities Limited 贏證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 20 July 2021 | |
Monex Boom Securities (H.K.) Limited 寶盛證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 31 August 2016 | |
Monex Boom Securities (H.K.) Limited 寶盛證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 03 October 2014 | |
Orient Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 東方證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 12 March 2013 | 25 April 2014 |
Orient Futures (Hong Kong) Limited 東方期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 28 January 2013 | 25 April 2014 |
Orient Securities (Hong Kong) Limited 東方證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 28 January 2013 | 25 April 2014 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 11 June 2010 | 01 August 2012 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 11 June 2010 | 01 August 2012 |
Quam Securities Limited 華富建業證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 18 July 2007 | 03 June 2010 |
Quam Securities Limited 華富建業證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 18 July 2007 | 03 June 2010 |