SFC Licences of KHONG Seow Ting 鄺曉婷
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Vanguard Investments Hong Kong Limited 領航投資香港有限公司 | RE | 4 | 31 May 2016 | 28 December 2018 |
Vanguard Investments Hong Kong Limited 領航投資香港有限公司 | RE | 1 | 31 May 2016 | 28 December 2018 |
Income Partners Asset Management (HK) Limited 弘收投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 05 December 2013 | 12 February 2016 |
Income Partners Asset Management (HK) Limited 弘收投資管理(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 05 December 2013 | 12 February 2016 |
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 10 March 2011 | 30 November 2012 |
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 01 August 2007 | 30 November 2012 |
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 August 2007 | 30 November 2012 |