SFC Licences of YEUNG Kin Ho 楊建豪
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CSC Securities (HK) Limited 群益證券(香港)有限公司 | RO | 2 | 22 July 2024 | |
CSC Futures (HK) Limited 群益期貨(香港)有限公司 | RO | 5 | 18 October 2021 | |
CSC Futures (HK) Limited 群益期貨(香港)有限公司 | RO | 2 | 24 May 2021 | |
CSC Futures (HK) Limited 群益期貨(香港)有限公司 | RO | 1 | 24 May 2021 | |
CSC Securities (HK) Limited 群益證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 07 January 2019 | |
CSC Futures (HK) Limited 群益期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 16 August 2018 | 24 May 2021 |
CSC Futures (HK) Limited 群益期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 16 August 2018 | 24 May 2021 |
Yuanta Futures (HK) Co., Limited 元大期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 09 May 2017 | 27 December 2017 |
KGI Futures (Hong Kong) Limited 凱基期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 20 April 2010 | 14 April 2017 |
KGI Asia Limited 凱基證券亞洲有限公司 | RE | 1 | 20 April 2010 | 14 April 2017 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 02 October 2007 | 12 April 2010 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 02 October 2007 | 12 April 2010 |