SFC Licences of HENDRY Cyrus Richard
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Niatross Investments Limited | RE | 9 | 01 August 2018 | 31 July 2020 |
Aspect Capital Asia Limited | RO | 4 | 26 March 2015 | 10 November 2017 |
Aspect Capital Asia Limited | RO | 1 | 26 March 2015 | 10 November 2017 |
Aspect Capital Asia Limited | RE | 1 | 10 June 2008 | 26 March 2015 |
Aspect Capital Asia Limited | RE | 4 | 10 June 2008 | 26 March 2015 |