SFC Licences of SHIU Peter Chung Tak 邵頌德
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 02 December 2015 | 29 July 2022 |
CASH Asset Management Limited 時富資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 24 September 2009 | 29 July 2022 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 24 August 2009 | 29 July 2022 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 15 June 2009 | 16 November 2012 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 10 June 2009 | 16 November 2012 |
OnePlatform Asset Management Limited 環一資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 17 December 2008 | 11 February 2009 |