SFC Licences of LEE Ming Gin 李明正
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gransing Securities Co., Limited 國投證券有限公司 | RE | 9 | 21 June 2016 | 30 September 2019 |
Gransing Securities Co., Limited 國投證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 21 June 2016 | 30 September 2019 |
Gransing Securities Co., Limited 國投證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 21 June 2016 | 30 September 2019 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RO | 4 | 14 January 2015 | 20 May 2016 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 11 March 2014 | 20 May 2016 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 11 March 2014 | 20 May 2016 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 11 March 2014 | 14 January 2015 |
Tengard Fund Management Limited 騰祺基金管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 09 July 2012 | 05 February 2014 |
Tengard Fund Management Limited 騰祺基金管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 09 July 2012 | 05 February 2014 |
Alpha Wealth Management Limited 艾法財富管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 29 April 2009 | 06 May 2012 |