SFC Licences of CHAN Kwan Chun 陳君俊
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 19 February 2010 | 04 May 2010 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 19 February 2010 | 04 May 2010 |
OnePlatform Asset Management Limited 環一資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 10 August 2009 | 15 January 2010 |