SFC Licences of NG Yuen Ling 吳婉玲
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
HSBC Broking Forex (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融外匯(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 26 October 2010 | 26 April 2012 |
HSBC Broking Securities (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融證券(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 23 July 2010 | 26 April 2012 |
HSBC Broking Futures (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融期貨(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 23 July 2010 | 26 April 2012 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 23 March 2010 | 08 July 2010 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 23 March 2010 | 08 July 2010 |