SFC Licences of BRUCK Cyprian Joannes
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Golden Full Asset Management Limited 金富資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 03 June 2014 | 22 July 2015 |
Golden Full Asset Management Limited 金富資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 03 June 2014 | 22 July 2015 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 02 July 2013 | 10 January 2014 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 02 July 2013 | 10 January 2014 |
De Riva Asia Limited | RE | 1 | 27 June 2011 | 28 June 2013 |
De Riva Asia Limited | RE | 2 | 27 June 2011 | 28 June 2013 |
IMC Asia Pacific Limited | RE | 2 | 13 May 2010 | 05 November 2010 |
IMC Asia Pacific Limited | RE | 1 | 13 May 2010 | 05 November 2010 |