SFC Licences of WONG Wan Kin 黃雲鍵
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Octal Capital Limited 八方金融有限公司 | RE | 6 | 05 June 2017 | 01 December 2018 |
Octal Capital Limited 八方金融有限公司 | RE | 1 | 05 June 2017 | 01 December 2018 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 17 November 2010 | 09 November 2013 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 17 November 2010 | 09 November 2013 |
Southwest Securities (HK) Futures Limited 西證(香港)期貨有限公司 | RE | 2 | 21 July 2010 | 21 July 2010 |
Southwest Securities (HK) Brokerage Limited 西證(香港)證券經紀有限公司 | RE | 1 | 21 July 2010 | 21 July 2010 |