SFC Licences of LAI Hoi Ki 黎凱琪
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 18 April 2011 | 19 February 2012 |
CES Forex (HK) Limited 光證外匯(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 11 March 2011 | 19 February 2012 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 11 March 2011 | 19 February 2012 |
Hafoo Securities Limited 哈富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 03 August 2010 | 10 December 2010 |
Wilson Securities Limited 滙生證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 03 August 2010 | 10 December 2010 |
Wilson Securities Limited 滙生證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 03 August 2010 | 10 December 2010 |