SFC Licences of RONG Yi 容憶
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Allard Partners Limited 全亞達投資有限公司 | RE | 9 | 06 June 2019 | 01 December 2020 |
Turiya Advisors Asia Limited | RE | 9 | 19 November 2013 | 02 May 2017 |
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 09 August 2010 | 27 September 2013 |
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 09 August 2010 | 27 September 2013 |
FIL Investment Advisors | RE | 4 | 09 August 2010 | 27 September 2013 |
FIL Investment Advisors | RE | 9 | 09 August 2010 | 27 September 2013 |