SFC Licences of CHUNG Wai Ho 鍾偉豪
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
OnePlatform Asset Management Limited 環一資產管理有限公司 | RO | 1 | 15 June 2021 | 18 February 2023 |
OnePlatform Asset Management Limited 環一資產管理有限公司 | RE | 1 | 15 March 2013 | 15 June 2021 |
CES Forex (HK) Limited 光證外匯(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 19 March 2012 | 15 February 2013 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 19 March 2012 | 15 February 2013 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 August 2011 | 15 February 2013 |
Yuanta Asia Investment (Hong Kong) Limited 元大亞洲投資(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 21 December 2010 | 06 July 2011 |