SFC Licences of LIN Wei Suen 連慧璇
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 24 December 2012 | 12 September 2015 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 28 June 2012 | 12 September 2015 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 21 February 2011 | 12 September 2015 |