SFC Licences of TANG Siu Kei 鄧兆基
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
China Industrial Securities International Futures Limited 興證國際期貨有限公司 | RO | 2 | 04 December 2023 | |
China Industrial Securities International Brokerage Limited 興證國際證券有限公司 | RO | 1 | 16 August 2023 | |
China Industrial Securities International Futures Limited 興證國際期貨有限公司 | RE | 2 | 11 June 2020 | 04 December 2023 |
China Industrial Securities International Brokerage Limited 興證國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 11 June 2020 | 16 August 2023 |
Zhongtai International Futures Limited 中泰國際期貨有限公司 | RE | 2 | 16 May 2014 | 10 September 2016 |
Zhongtai International Securities Limited 中泰國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 16 May 2014 | 10 September 2016 |
CSC Securities (HK) Limited 群益證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 30 August 2013 | 07 May 2014 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 28 April 2011 | 20 August 2013 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 28 April 2011 | 20 August 2013 |