SFC Licences of LAM Siu Lung 林兆龍
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 17 September 2014 | 27 January 2015 |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 17 September 2014 | 27 January 2015 |
HSBC Broking Forex (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融外匯(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 14 August 2014 | 01 September 2014 |
HSBC Broking Futures (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融期貨(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 07 May 2014 | 01 September 2014 |
HSBC Broking Securities (Asia) Limited 滙豐金融證券(亞洲)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 23 December 2013 | 01 September 2014 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 28 July 2011 | 24 March 2012 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 28 July 2011 | 24 March 2012 |
CES Forex (HK) Limited 光證外匯(香港)有限公司 | RE | 3 | 28 July 2011 | 20 January 2012 |