SFC Licences of WENG Ryan 翁溫鈉
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
iFAST Global Markets (HK) Limited 奕豐環球市場(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 16 June 2014 | 17 October 2014 |
iFAST Global Markets (HK) Limited 奕豐環球市場(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 16 June 2014 | 17 October 2014 |
iFAST Financial (HK) Limited 奕豐金融(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 16 June 2014 | 17 October 2014 |
iFAST Financial (HK) Limited 奕豐金融(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 16 June 2014 | 17 October 2014 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 12 March 2012 | 09 December 2012 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 12 March 2012 | 09 December 2012 |