SFC Licences of YU Wai Lung 余偉龍
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Quam Securities Limited 華富建業證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 09 August 2016 | 14 September 2018 |
Quam Securities Limited 華富建業證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 09 August 2016 | 14 September 2018 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 15 May 2014 | 12 July 2016 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 15 May 2014 | 12 July 2016 |