SFC Licences of KWAN Yiu Hei 關曜熙
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
TX Capital (HK) Limited | RE | 9 | 27 September 2017 | 21 June 2018 |
FIL Investment Advisors | RE | 9 | 03 February 2016 | 11 August 2017 |
FIL Investment Advisors | RE | 4 | 03 February 2016 | 11 August 2017 |
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 9 | 03 February 2016 | 11 August 2017 |
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 01 August 2014 | 11 August 2017 |
FIL Investment Management (Hong Kong) Limited 富達基金(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 01 August 2014 | 11 August 2017 |