SFC Licences of DU Zewei 杜澤薇
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 5 | 04 May 2016 | 31 October 2017 |
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 04 May 2016 | 31 October 2017 |
Longrun Financial Group Limited 朗潤金融集團有限公司 | RE | 2 | 23 June 2015 | 26 April 2016 |