SFC Licences of HAN Longkai 韓隆凱
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Longrun Financial Group Limited 朗潤金融集團有限公司 | RO | 5 | 10 July 2018 | 30 September 2019 |
Longrun Financial Group Limited 朗潤金融集團有限公司 | RO | 2 | 10 July 2018 | 30 September 2019 |
Longrun Financial Group Limited 朗潤金融集團有限公司 | RE | 5 | 15 February 2017 | 10 July 2018 |
Longrun Financial Group Limited 朗潤金融集團有限公司 | RE | 2 | 24 February 2015 | 10 July 2018 |