SFC Licences of TANG Chun Pong 鄧振邦
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Diligent Capital Limited 道勤資本有限公司 | RO | 6 | 30 June 2022 | |
Diligent Capital Limited 道勤資本有限公司 | RE | 6 | 01 June 2022 | 30 June 2022 |
Euto Capital Partners Limited 裕韜資本有限公司 | RO | 6 | 02 August 2021 | 23 April 2022 |
Runlin Asset Management Limited 潤林資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 05 September 2019 | 05 August 2021 |
Euto Capital Partners Limited 裕韜資本有限公司 | RE | 6 | 26 June 2015 | 02 August 2021 |