SFC Licences of PANG Min Chu 彭勉珠
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 24 April 2018 | |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 24 April 2018 | |
Yuanta Futures (HK) Co., Limited 元大期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 5 | 18 April 2017 | 08 August 2017 |
Yuanta Futures (HK) Co., Limited 元大期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 18 April 2017 | 08 August 2017 |
Yuanta Securities (Hong Kong) Company Limited 元大證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 5 | 30 September 2015 | 08 August 2017 |
Yuanta Securities (Hong Kong) Company Limited 元大證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 4 | 30 September 2015 | 08 August 2017 |
Yuanta Securities (Hong Kong) Company Limited 元大證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 30 September 2015 | 08 August 2017 |
Yuanta Securities (Hong Kong) Company Limited 元大證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 30 September 2015 | 08 August 2017 |