SFC Licences of ZHOU Xikun 周錫坤
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fosun International Securities Limited 復星國際證券有限公司 | RE | 4 | 13 April 2017 | 04 November 2018 |
Fosun International Securities Limited 復星國際證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 14 March 2016 | 04 November 2018 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 07 October 2015 | 19 February 2016 |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 07 October 2015 | 19 February 2016 |