SFC Licences of YUEN Mau Sang 袁茂生
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
China Everbright Assets Management Limited 中國光大資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 10 October 2023 | |
China Everbright Assets Management Limited 中國光大資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 10 October 2023 | |
China Everbright Assets Management Limited 中國光大資產管理有限公司 | RE | 1 | 10 October 2023 | |
CES Commodities (HK) Limited 光證期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 04 June 2018 | 24 September 2018 |
Everbright Securities Investment Services (HK) Limited 光大證券投資服務(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 17 October 2017 | 24 September 2018 |