SFC Licences of NG Ping Kin 吳炳堅
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 10 November 2021 | |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 04 September 2020 | |
CASH Asset Management Limited 時富資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 08 May 2019 | 07 August 2020 |
Celestial Commodities Limited 時富商品有限公司 | RE | 2 | 13 November 2017 | 07 August 2020 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 13 November 2017 | 07 August 2020 |