SFC Licences of TANG Jieqiong 唐洁琼
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CCB International Securities Limited 建銀國際證券有限公司 | RE | 2 | 17 June 2021 | |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 19 April 2021 | 26 May 2021 |
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 5 | 09 October 2019 | 26 May 2021 |
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 04 September 2019 | 26 May 2021 |
Jinrui Futures (Hong Kong) Limited 金瑞期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 11 June 2018 | 09 August 2019 |