SFC Licences of YAN Yijie 嚴藝婕
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
China Merchants Futures (HK) Co., Limited 招商期貨(香港)有限公司 | RE | 2 | 14 September 2022 | |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 14 September 2022 | |
BIL Wealth Management Limited 盧銀資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 02 November 2020 | 04 June 2021 |
BIL Wealth Management Limited 盧銀資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 02 November 2020 | 04 June 2021 |
BIL Wealth Management Limited 盧銀資產管理有限公司 | RE | 1 | 16 October 2020 | 04 June 2021 |
China Merchants Securities (HK) Co., Limited 招商證券(香港)有限公司 | RE | 1 | 03 May 2018 | 18 September 2020 |