SFC Licences of BREZINSKI Brad Thomas
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Robeco Hong Kong Limited | RE | 1 | 23 August 2024 | 30 August 2024 |
Robeco Hong Kong Limited | RE | 1 | 21 February 2023 | 23 February 2023 |
Robeco Hong Kong Limited | RE | 1 | 01 August 2022 | 09 August 2022 |
Robeco Hong Kong Limited | RE | 1 | 14 January 2019 | 31 January 2019 |
Robeco Hong Kong Limited | RE | 1 | 20 April 2018 | 30 April 2018 |