SFC Licences of LIN Yen-Chuan 林彥全
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RO | 9 | 06 May 2021 | 04 December 2022 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RO | 4 | 06 May 2021 | 04 December 2022 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RO | 1 | 06 May 2021 | 04 December 2022 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 30 March 2021 | 06 May 2021 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 30 March 2021 | 06 May 2021 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 30 March 2021 | 06 May 2021 |
SinoPac Asset Management (Asia) Limited 永豐金資產管理(亞洲)有限公司 | RO | 9 | 26 November 2018 | 06 March 2021 |
SinoPac Asset Management (Asia) Limited 永豐金資產管理(亞洲)有限公司 | RO | 4 | 26 November 2018 | 06 March 2021 |
SinoPac Asset Management (Asia) Limited 永豐金資產管理(亞洲)有限公司 | RO | 1 | 26 November 2018 | 06 March 2021 |