SFC Licences of NG Wing Yu 伍穎渝
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Primas Asset Management Limited 博領資產管理有限公司 | RE | 9 | 10 July 2019 | 06 October 2022 |
S&P Global Ratings Hong Kong Limited | RE | 10 | 29 October 2018 | 24 May 2019 |