SFC Licences of FU Hin Lun 傅顯倫
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 05 January 2024 | 22 April 2024 |
CASH Wealth Management Limited 時富財富管理有限公司 | RE | 1 | 05 January 2024 | 22 April 2024 |
Celestial Securities Limited 時富證券有限公司 | RE | 1 | 05 January 2024 | 22 April 2024 |
OnePlatform Asset Management Limited 環一資產管理有限公司 | RE | 4 | 06 March 2020 | 28 November 2023 |
OnePlatform Asset Management Limited 環一資產管理有限公司 | RE | 1 | 06 March 2020 | 28 November 2023 |