SFC Licences of DOUMA John
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
International Commerce Corporation | RE | 9 | 28 April 2009 | 23 March 2020 |
International Commerce Corporation | RE | 4 | 28 April 2009 | 23 March 2020 |
Chimaera Financial Group Limited | RO | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 11 September 2009 |
Chimaera Financial Group Limited | RO | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 11 September 2009 |
Chimaera Financial Group Limited | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 25 February 2005 |