SFC Licences of CHAU Cheuk Wah 周卓華
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Institution | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
Golden Jade Capital Limited 金瑜融資有限公司 | RO | 6 | 23 July 2008 | 29 July 2014 |
Chanceton Capital Partners Limited 川盟融資有限公司 | RO | 6 | 06 August 2007 | 11 July 2008 |
Optima Capital Limited 創越融資有限公司 | RO | 6 | 01 June 2005 | 02 May 2007 |
Hooray Capital Limited 好盈融資有限公司 | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 01 November 2004 |