SFC Licenceholders of Optima Capital Limited 創越融資有限公司
- cs@optima-capital.hk
- Website
- www.optima-capital.hk
Source:
Official SFC record
Key: RE = Representative, RO = Responsible Officer, EO = Executive Officer
Licenceholders | Role | Licences | Start date | End date |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHAN Ho Chuen Bosco 陳浩泉 | RE | 6 | 02 July 2020 | 13 November 2022 |
CHAN Ho Chuen Bosco 陳浩泉 | RE | 1 | 02 July 2020 | 13 November 2022 |
CHAN Ho Ying 陳可瑩 | RE | 1 | 23 September 2021 | 26 April 2024 |
CHAN Ho Ying 陳可瑩 | RE | 6 | 23 September 2021 | |
CHAN Ka Yee 陳家怡 | RO | 6 | 04 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 |
CHAN Ka Yee 陳家怡 | RO | 4 | 04 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 |
CHAN Ka Yee 陳家怡 | RO | 1 | 04 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 |
CHAN Ka Yee 陳家怡 | RE | 6 | 18 March 2022 | 04 April 2022 |
CHAN Ka Yee 陳家怡 | RE | 4 | 18 March 2022 | 04 April 2022 |
CHAN Ka Yee 陳家怡 | RE | 1 | 18 March 2022 | 04 April 2022 |
CHAN Kwan Pak 陳君柏 | RE | 6 | 27 February 2018 | 22 May 2020 |
CHAN Kwan Pak 陳君柏 | RE | 1 | 27 February 2018 | 22 May 2020 |
CHAN Pui Ming 陳佩明 | RE | 6 | 03 July 2008 | 01 September 2008 |
CHAN Pui Ming 陳佩明 | RE | 1 | 25 August 2008 | 28 March 2013 |
CHAN Pui Ming 陳佩明 | RE | 4 | 25 August 2008 | 28 March 2013 |
CHAN Pui Ming 陳佩明 | RO | 6 | 01 September 2008 | 28 March 2013 |
CHAN Shung Fai 陳崇輝 | RE | 6 | 26 June 2003 | 01 May 2004 |
CHANG Ludwig | RE | 6 | 18 August 2003 | 07 May 2004 |
CHAU Cheuk Wah 周卓華 | RO | 6 | 01 June 2005 | 02 May 2007 |
CHEN Tsun Kit 陳俊傑 | RO | 6 | 02 March 2018 | 25 May 2019 |
CHEN Tsun Kit 陳俊傑 | RE | 1 | 09 January 2018 | 25 May 2019 |
CHEN Tsun Kit 陳俊傑 | RE | 6 | 09 January 2018 | 02 March 2018 |
CHENG King Hang 鄭敬鏗 | RO | 1 | 05 July 2019 | 30 May 2024 |
CHENG King Hang 鄭敬鏗 | RO | 6 | 05 July 2019 | |
CHENG King Hang 鄭敬鏗 | RE | 1 | 03 October 2011 | 05 July 2019 |
CHENG King Hang 鄭敬鏗 | RE | 6 | 03 October 2011 | 05 July 2019 |
CHEUNG Pui Yan, Jennifer 蔣沛欣 | RE | 1 | 07 July 2008 | 18 July 2008 |
CHEUNG Pui Yan, Jennifer 蔣沛欣 | RE | 6 | 07 July 2008 | 18 July 2008 |
CHEUNG Pui Yan, Jennifer 蔣沛欣 | RE | 4 | 07 July 2008 | 18 July 2008 |
CHEUNG Tsz Yui 張子睿 | RE | 6 | 18 October 2021 | 16 June 2023 |
CHEUNG Tsz Yui 張子睿 | RE | 1 | 18 October 2021 | 16 June 2023 |
CHEUNG Tsz Yui 張子睿 | RE | 6 | 01 November 2016 | 16 June 2021 |
CHEUNG Tsz Yui 張子睿 | RE | 1 | 01 November 2016 | 16 June 2021 |
CHEUNG Yin Man, Monica 張彥文 | RE | 1 | 02 August 2010 | 02 August 2010 |
CHEUNG Yin Man, Monica 張彥文 | RE | 6 | 02 August 2010 | 02 August 2010 |
CHING On Pong, Caspar 程安邦 | RE | 6 | 12 April 2017 | 03 February 2018 |
CHING On Pong, Caspar 程安邦 | RE | 1 | 12 April 2017 | 03 February 2018 |
CHOI Ho Yi, Phyllis 蔡可兒 | RE | 1 | 03 June 2009 | 13 February 2010 |
CHOI Ho Yi, Phyllis 蔡可兒 | RE | 6 | 03 June 2009 | 13 February 2010 |
CHUM Hon Wang, Michael 覃漢宏 | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 04 August 2005 |
CHUNG Christine Jui-Mei 鍾瑞美 | RO | 6 | 19 February 2004 | 29 December 2005 |
CHUNG Christine Jui-Mei 鍾瑞美 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 19 February 2004 |
CHUNG Christine Jui-Mei 鍾瑞美 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
CHUNG Christine Jui-Mei 鍾瑞美 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
CHUNG Kin Shun, Jimmy 鍾建舜 | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 11 August 2003 |
FOK Ka Chun 霍嘉俊 | RE | 6 | 05 March 2018 | 06 August 2021 |
FOK Ka Chun 霍嘉俊 | RE | 1 | 05 March 2018 | 06 August 2021 |
FONG Chung Bo 方松波 | RE | 6 | 10 July 2007 | 22 September 2010 |
FONG Chung Bo 方松波 | RE | 1 | 21 November 2007 | 22 September 2010 |
FU Yiu Man, Peter 符耀文 | RO | 6 | 05 February 2004 | 20 May 2004 |
HA Yu Ho 夏余昊 | RE | 6 | 10 July 2007 | 25 March 2008 |
HA Yu Ho 夏余昊 | RE | 1 | 21 November 2007 | 25 March 2008 |
HO Wing Man, Ginny 何詠雯 | RE | 6 | 12 June 2007 | 08 August 2007 |
HONG Tsz Leung 康子亮 | RE | 6 | 23 May 2006 | 01 October 2006 |
HUI Wai Yan, Kelly 許慧欣 | RE | 6 | 09 June 2017 | 05 August 2017 |
HUI Wai Yan, Kelly 許慧欣 | RE | 1 | 09 June 2017 | 05 August 2017 |
HWANG Wai Ki, Christine 黃蔚祺 | RE | 6 | 13 October 2016 | 14 July 2021 |
HWANG Wai Ki, Christine 黃蔚祺 | RE | 1 | 13 October 2016 | 14 July 2021 |
IP Po Wun 葉保垣 | RE | 6 | 17 November 2021 | 31 December 2022 |
IP Po Wun 葉保垣 | RE | 4 | 17 November 2021 | 31 December 2022 |
IP Po Wun 葉保垣 | RE | 1 | 17 November 2021 | 31 December 2022 |
KAM Hay Man 金熙雯 | RO | 6 | 04 July 2017 | 07 November 2021 |
KAM Hay Man 金熙雯 | RO | 1 | 04 July 2017 | 07 November 2021 |
KAM Hay Man 金熙雯 | RE | 6 | 03 November 2008 | 04 July 2017 |
KAM Hay Man 金熙雯 | RE | 1 | 03 November 2008 | 04 July 2017 |
KAM Ka Ka 甘嘉嘉 | RO | 6 | 24 May 2018 | 01 August 2023 |
KAM Ka Ka 甘嘉嘉 | RO | 1 | 24 May 2018 | 01 August 2023 |
KAM Ka Ka 甘嘉嘉 | RE | 1 | 30 September 2010 | 24 May 2018 |
KAM Ka Ka 甘嘉嘉 | RE | 6 | 30 September 2010 | 24 May 2018 |
KONG Lai Wan WInnie 江麗雲 | RO | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 11 May 2004 |
KWOK Chung Ho 郭仲豪 | RE | 4 | 21 November 2007 | 31 March 2010 |
KWOK Chung Ho 郭仲豪 | RE | 1 | 21 November 2007 | 24 May 2011 |
KWOK Chung Ho 郭仲豪 | RE | 6 | 03 July 2007 | 24 May 2011 |
KWOK Lai Ki, Stella 郭勵錡 | RE | 1 | 20 November 2007 | 28 December 2007 |
KWOK Lai Ki, Stella 郭勵錡 | RE | 6 | 21 March 2006 | 28 December 2007 |
KWONG Hoi Yan 鄺愷欣 | RO | 6 | 16 May 2006 | 01 April 2007 |
KWONG Hoi Yan 鄺愷欣 | RE | 6 | 10 April 2006 | 16 May 2006 |
KWONG Ka Leung 鄺嘉樑 | RE | 6 | 02 October 2015 | 21 September 2016 |
KWONG Ka Leung 鄺嘉樑 | RE | 1 | 02 October 2015 | 21 September 2016 |
LAI Chun Leung, Barton 黎振良 | RE | 6 | 01 August 2008 | 24 May 2011 |
LAI Chun Leung, Barton 黎振良 | RE | 1 | 01 August 2008 | 24 May 2011 |
LAI Chun Leung, Barton 黎振良 | RE | 4 | 01 August 2008 | 31 March 2010 |
LAI Yan Tung 黎欣彤 | RE | 1 | 15 June 2015 | 15 August 2021 |
LAI Yan Tung 黎欣彤 | RE | 6 | 15 June 2015 | 15 August 2021 |
LAM Ho Yu 林可瑜 | RE | 6 | 10 November 2010 | 13 September 2011 |
LAM Ho Yu 林可瑜 | RE | 1 | 10 November 2010 | 13 September 2011 |
LAM Kwan Wai 林坤緯 | RE | 6 | 16 October 2020 | 23 February 2023 |
LAM Kwan Wai 林坤緯 | RE | 1 | 16 October 2020 | 23 February 2023 |
LAM Kwun Wai 林冠瑋 | RE | 6 | 20 October 2010 | 16 April 2017 |
LAM Kwun Wai 林冠瑋 | RE | 1 | 20 October 2010 | 16 April 2017 |
LAM Wai Hon 林懷漢 | RO | 6 | 11 October 2022 | 11 January 2023 |
LAM Wai Hon 林懷漢 | RE | 4 | 11 October 2022 | 11 January 2023 |
LAM Wai Hon 林懷漢 | RE | 1 | 11 October 2022 | 11 January 2023 |
LAU Pui Yu 劉珮瑜 | RE | 1 | 20 November 2007 | 19 October 2010 |
LAU Pui Yu 劉珮瑜 | RE | 6 | 10 April 2007 | 19 October 2010 |
LEE Cheuk Kwan, Vulcan 李焯鈞 | RE | 6 | 02 October 2009 | 08 March 2014 |
LEE Cheuk Kwan, Vulcan 李焯鈞 | RE | 1 | 02 October 2009 | 08 March 2014 |
LEE Chi Hwa, Joshua 李智華 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 24 September 2003 |
LEE Chi Hwa, Joshua 李智華 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
LEE Chi Hwa, Joshua 李智華 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
LEE Sum Yin 李心妍 | RE | 6 | 09 January 2015 | 14 September 2019 |
LEE Sum Yin 李心妍 | RE | 1 | 09 January 2015 | 14 September 2019 |
LEUNG Ada Yuk-Ching 梁玉青 | RE | 6 | 29 June 2007 | 13 February 2010 |
LEUNG Ada Yuk-Ching 梁玉青 | RE | 1 | 20 November 2007 | 13 February 2010 |
LEUNG Ada Yuk-Ching 梁玉青 | RE | 4 | 20 November 2007 | 13 February 2010 |
LEUNG Chuen Fai 梁泉輝 | RO | 4 | 23 January 2024 | |
LEUNG Chuen Fai 梁泉輝 | RO | 1 | 14 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 |
LEUNG Chuen Fai 梁泉輝 | RO | 6 | 14 August 2023 | |
LEUNG Chuen Fai 梁泉輝 | RE | 6 | 07 June 2023 | 14 August 2023 |
LEUNG Chuen Fai 梁泉輝 | RE | 1 | 07 June 2023 | 14 August 2023 |
LEUNG Ho Tsin 梁浩正 | RE | 1 | 09 January 2018 | 17 April 2019 |
LEUNG Ho Tsin 梁浩正 | RE | 6 | 09 January 2018 | 17 April 2019 |
LEUNG Man Kit 梁民傑 | RO | 6 | 23 June 2005 | 15 November 2005 |
LEUNG Man Kit 梁民傑 | RE | 6 | 25 April 2005 | 23 June 2005 |
LEUNG Mei Han 梁美嫻 | RO | 4 | 25 October 2007 | |
LEUNG Mei Han 梁美嫻 | RO | 1 | 25 October 2007 | 30 May 2024 |
LEUNG Mei Han 梁美嫻 | RE | 6 | 28 May 2007 | 15 June 2007 |
LEUNG Mei Han 梁美嫻 | RO | 6 | 15 June 2007 | |
LI Jin Hua 李晉華 | RE | 6 | 23 July 2003 | 20 April 2004 |
LI Wing Yiu | RE | 1 | 15 March 2023 | 26 April 2024 |
LI Wing Yiu | RE | 6 | 15 March 2023 | |
LIN Min 林敏 | RE | 1 | 23 March 2023 | 26 April 2024 |
LIN Min 林敏 | RE | 6 | 23 March 2023 | |
LIU Chi Wai 廖子慧 | RO | 6 | 18 April 2007 | 20 January 2009 |
LIU Chi Wai 廖子慧 | RE | 1 | 26 November 2007 | 20 January 2009 |
LIU Chi Wai 廖子慧 | RE | 6 | 13 April 2005 | 18 April 2007 |
LO Chi Pang 魯志鵬 | RE | 1 | 12 May 2014 | 26 April 2024 |
LO Chi Pang 魯志鵬 | RE | 6 | 12 May 2014 | |
LUI Tak Yan 呂德仁 | RE | 6 | 08 August 2005 | 20 December 2005 |
LUNG Chung Mei, Beatrice 龍松媚 | RE | 6 | 04 June 2007 | 29 June 2007 |
LUNG Chung Mei, Beatrice 龍松媚 | RO | 4 | 25 October 2007 | 06 October 2022 |
LUNG Chung Mei, Beatrice 龍松媚 | RO | 1 | 25 October 2007 | 06 October 2022 |
LUNG Chung Mei, Beatrice 龍松媚 | RO | 6 | 29 June 2007 | 06 October 2022 |
MA Hok Ming 馬學銘 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 27 May 2004 |
MA Hok Ming 馬學銘 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
MA Hok Ming 馬學銘 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
MAK Ho Bun, John 麥浩彬 | RE | 6 | 21 May 2012 | 31 May 2013 |
MAN Nok Yan, Gladys 文諾欣 | RE | 6 | 26 October 2010 | 12 November 2012 |
MAN Nok Yan, Gladys 文諾欣 | RE | 1 | 26 October 2010 | 12 November 2012 |
MUI Ho Cheung, Gary 梅浩彰 | RO | 1 | 25 October 2007 | 09 January 2009 |
MUI Ho Cheung, Gary 梅浩彰 | RO | 6 | 14 December 2005 | 09 January 2009 |
MUI Ho Cheung, Gary 梅浩彰 | RE | 6 | 14 September 2005 | 14 December 2005 |
NG Cho Wong 吳楚旺 | RE | 6 | 24 October 2016 | 15 July 2021 |
NG Cho Wong 吳楚旺 | RE | 1 | 24 October 2016 | 15 July 2021 |
NG Chung Ka 吳宗家 | RE | 1 | 15 June 2015 | 05 September 2021 |
NG Chung Ka 吳宗家 | RE | 6 | 15 June 2015 | 05 September 2021 |
NG Derrick Ming Tsun 吳銘浚 | RE | 6 | 15 May 2017 | 15 February 2020 |
NG Derrick Ming Tsun 吳銘浚 | RE | 1 | 15 May 2017 | 15 February 2020 |
NG Ka Po 吳家保 | RE | 1 | 20 November 2007 | 15 October 2008 |
NG Ka Po 吳家保 | RO | 1 | 15 October 2008 | 30 May 2024 |
NG Ka Po 吳家保 | RO | 6 | 15 October 2008 | |
NG Ka Po 吳家保 | RO | 4 | 15 October 2008 | |
NG Ka Po 吳家保 | RE | 6 | 23 May 2007 | 15 October 2008 |
NG Ka Po 吳家保 | RE | 4 | 20 November 2007 | 15 October 2008 |
NG Kin Kwan 吳建群 | RE | 6 | 03 June 2013 | 27 May 2017 |
NG Kin Kwan 吳建群 | RE | 1 | 03 June 2013 | 27 May 2017 |
NG Kwok Fai 吳國輝 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 11 May 2004 |
NG Kwok Fai 吳國輝 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
NG Kwok Fai 吳國輝 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
NG Lai Man, Carmen 吳麗文 | RE | 6 | 13 June 2007 | 24 December 2007 |
NG Ming Yui 吳銘銳 | RE | 1 | 23 February 2009 | 05 August 2009 |
NG Ming Yui 吳銘銳 | RE | 6 | 23 February 2009 | 05 August 2009 |
NG Ming Yui 吳銘銳 | RE | 4 | 23 February 2009 | 05 August 2009 |
NG Vivian 伍穎思 | RE | 6 | 18 August 2008 | 16 October 2012 |
NG Vivian 伍穎思 | RE | 4 | 08 September 2008 | 31 March 2010 |
NG Vivian 伍穎思 | RE | 1 | 08 September 2008 | 16 October 2012 |
NG Wing Sang 吳榮燊 | RE | 6 | 01 September 2010 | 18 April 2014 |
NG Wing Sang 吳榮燊 | RE | 1 | 01 September 2010 | 18 April 2014 |
NG Yuk Wai 吳育偉 | RE | 1 | 26 May 2014 | 02 August 2021 |
NG Yuk Wai 吳育偉 | RE | 6 | 26 May 2014 | 02 August 2021 |
REN Xiaopeng 任曉鵬 | RE | 6 | 23 June 2008 | 30 September 2010 |
REN Xiaopeng 任曉鵬 | RE | 1 | 23 June 2008 | 30 September 2010 |
REN Xiaopeng 任曉鵬 | RE | 4 | 23 June 2008 | 31 March 2010 |
SHIN Yick Fabian 冼易 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 11 May 2004 |
SHIN Yick Fabian 冼易 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
SHIN Yick Fabian 冼易 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
SO Pak Chee, Percy 蘇柏姿 | RE | 1 | 26 April 2010 | 07 September 2010 |
SO Pak Chee, Percy 蘇柏姿 | RE | 6 | 26 April 2010 | 07 September 2010 |
SO Yiu Fung 蘇堯鋒 | RE | 1 | 25 November 2011 | 08 March 2014 |
SO Yiu Fung 蘇堯鋒 | RE | 6 | 07 October 2011 | 08 March 2014 |
TAM Ka Yu 譚家裕 | RE | 1 | 20 November 2007 | 13 February 2014 |
TAM Ka Yu 譚家裕 | RE | 4 | 20 November 2007 | 31 March 2010 |
TAM Ka Yu 譚家裕 | RE | 6 | 06 August 2007 | 13 February 2014 |
TAM Wing Fai, Johnny 譚永輝 | RE | 6 | 14 June 2007 | 09 July 2007 |
TAM Wing Fai, Johnny 譚永輝 | RO | 6 | 09 July 2007 | 08 August 2007 |
TANG Chun Fai, Billy 鄧振輝 | RE | 1 | 20 November 2007 | 30 June 2009 |
TANG Chun Fai, Billy 鄧振輝 | RO | 6 | 25 September 2008 | 30 June 2009 |
TANG Chun Fai, Billy 鄧振輝 | RE | 6 | 28 June 2007 | 25 September 2008 |
TANG Chun Fai, Billy 鄧振輝 | RE | 4 | 20 November 2007 | 30 June 2009 |
TOSE He-man Hubert Wang 王憲文 | RE | 6 | 26 June 2003 | 30 April 2004 |
TSANG Chiu Ping 曾昭平 | RE | 6 | 01 September 2010 | 30 October 2014 |
TSANG Chiu Ping 曾昭平 | RE | 1 | 01 September 2010 | 30 October 2014 |
TSANG Tak Chi 曾德芝 | RE | 6 | 01 April 2003 | 07 May 2004 |
TSANG Tak Chi 曾德芝 | RE | 9 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
TSANG Tak Chi 曾德芝 | RE | 4 | 01 April 2003 | 11 July 2003 |
TSANG Wing Yee 曾詠儀 | RO | 6 | 16 June 2005 | 14 March 2006 |
TSANG Wing Yee 曾詠儀 | RE | 6 | 13 May 2005 | 16 June 2005 |
WONG Chak Sang 王澤生 | RE | 6 | 03 June 2013 | 09 April 2015 |
WONG Chak Sang 王澤生 | RE | 1 | 03 June 2013 | 09 April 2015 |
WONG Kwok Ping 黃國平 | RE | 1 | 19 April 2018 | 30 April 2021 |
WONG Kwok Ping 黃國平 | RE | 6 | 20 March 2018 | 30 April 2021 |
WONG Man Ming, Melinda 黃敏明 | RO | 6 | 02 May 2019 | 30 September 2022 |
WONG Man Ming, Melinda 黃敏明 | RE | 1 | 31 January 2019 | 30 September 2022 |
WONG Man Ming, Melinda 黃敏明 | RE | 6 | 31 January 2019 | 02 May 2019 |
WONG Man Ming, Melinda 黃敏明 | RE | 6 | 20 July 2009 | 05 August 2011 |
WONG Man Ming, Melinda 黃敏明 | RE | 1 | 20 July 2009 | 05 August 2011 |
WONG Ngai Man, Samuel 汪毅民 | RE | 1 | 16 May 2014 | 01 January 2016 |
WONG Ngai Man, Samuel 汪毅民 | RE | 6 | 19 November 2013 | 01 January 2016 |
WONG Tsz Ying 王子盈 | RE | 6 | 23 April 2014 | 24 November 2017 |
WONG Tsz Ying 王子盈 | RE | 1 | 23 April 2014 | 24 November 2017 |
WONG Yin Chi 王彥慈 | RO | 6 | 26 September 2014 | 29 July 2016 |
WONG Yin Chi 王彥慈 | RE | 1 | 22 July 2014 | 29 July 2016 |
WONG Yin Chi 王彥慈 | RE | 6 | 22 July 2014 | 26 September 2014 |
WONG Yin Chi 王彥慈 | RE | 6 | 21 January 2008 | 01 July 2010 |
WONG Yin Chi 王彥慈 | RE | 1 | 11 February 2008 | 01 July 2010 |
WU Lap Yee, Letty 胡立怡 | RE | 1 | 20 November 2007 | 03 December 2010 |
WU Lap Yee, Letty 胡立怡 | RE | 6 | 05 September 2007 | 03 December 2010 |
WU Lap Yee, Letty 胡立怡 | RE | 4 | 20 November 2007 | 31 March 2010 |
YANG Te Hau 楊得灝 | RE | 6 | 06 October 2003 | 07 May 2004 |
YEUNG Wai Kei 楊偉基 | RE | 4 | 20 November 2007 | 31 March 2010 |
YEUNG Wai Kei 楊偉基 | RE | 6 | 22 May 2007 | 01 July 2014 |
YEUNG Wai Kei 楊偉基 | RE | 1 | 20 November 2007 | 01 July 2014 |
YEUNG Yat Chuen 楊日泉 | RE | 6 | 19 October 2011 | 31 December 2012 |
YEUNG Yat Chuen 楊日泉 | RE | 1 | 19 October 2011 | 31 December 2012 |
YIP Chui Ping, Lisa 葉翠萍 | RE | 6 | 05 March 2010 | 07 September 2010 |
YIP Chui Ping, Lisa 葉翠萍 | RE | 1 | 05 March 2010 | 07 September 2010 |
YU Yiu Lun Christopher 余曜燐 | RE | 1 | 11 October 2021 | 26 April 2024 |
YU Yiu Lun Christopher 余曜燐 | RE | 6 | 11 October 2021 |